Home > Glacier Bank > History

Glacier Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Glacier Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1955-07-15Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings Bank of Montana
1984-07-31Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
1989-01-01Acquired Glacier National Bank (22272) in COLUMBIA FALLS, MT
1992-12-01Changed name to Glacier Bank F.S.B.
1998-02-01Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK
1998-02-01Changed name to Glacier Bank
1998-02-01Reorganized.
2007-01-27Acquired First Citizens Bank, National Association (26682) in COLUMBIA FALLS, MT
2008-05-01Acquired Glacier Bank of Whitefish (2204) in WHITEFISH, MT
2011-04-19Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS
2011-04-19Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
2012-04-30Acquired Mountain West Bank (33844) in COEUR D ALENE, ID
2012-04-30Acquired First Security Bank of Missoula (21010) in MISSOULA, MT
2012-04-30Acquired Western Security Bank (57248) in BILLINGS, MT
2012-04-30Acquired 1ST BANK (16522) in EVANSTON, WY
2012-04-30Acquired Valley Bank of Helena (22747) in HELENA, MT
2012-04-30Acquired Citizens Community Bank (34459) in POCATELLO, ID
2012-04-30Acquired Big Sky Western Bank (32871) in BOZEMAN, MT
2012-04-30Acquired Bank of the San Juans (34873) in DURANGO, CO
2012-04-30Acquired First Bank of Wyoming (2226) in POWELL, WY
2012-04-30Acquired First Bank of Montana (2191) in LEWISTOWN, MT
2013-06-01Acquired First State Bank (23318) in WHEATLAND, WY
2013-08-01Acquired North Cascades National Bank (26846) in CHELAN, WA
2014-08-31Acquired First National Bank of the Rockies (3041) in GRAND JUNCTION, CO
2015-02-28Acquired Community Bank, Inc. (1979) in RONAN, MT
2015-10-31Acquired Canon National Bank (21801) in CANON CITY, CO
2016-09-01Acquired Treasure State Bank (58454) in MISSOULA, MT
2017-05-01Acquired The Foothills Bank (34573) in YUMA, AZ
2018-01-31Acquired Collegiate Peaks Bank (26916) in BUENA VISTA, CO
2018-02-28Acquired First Security Bank (1520) in BOZEMAN, MT
2019-04-29Acquired The First National Bank of Layton (2260) in LAYTON, UT
2019-07-31Acquired Heritage Bank of Nevada (34072) in RENO, NV
2020-02-29Acquired State Bank of Arizona (33508) in LAKE HAVASU CITY, AZ