Home > German American Bank > History
German American Bank, History
The following are major historical events for German American Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1910-11-10 | Institution established: Original name:The German American Bank | |
1986-05-01 | Acquired Bank of Ireland (18624) in IRELAND, IN | |
2000-10-01 | Acquired The Holland National Bank (4396) in HOLLAND, IN | |
2006-09-30 | Changed name to German American Bancorp | |
2006-09-30 | Acquired Stone City Bank of Bedford, Indiana (4386) in BEDFORD, IN | |
2006-09-30 | Acquired Peoples Bank (4417) in WASHINGTON, IN | |
2006-09-30 | Acquired First State Bank, Southwest Indiana (33949) in TELL CITY, IN | |
2006-09-30 | Acquired First American Bank (29630) in VINCENNES, IN | |
2006-09-30 | Acquired Citizens State Bank (11341) in PETERSBURG, IN | |
2011-01-01 | Acquired Bank of Evansville (57122) in EVANSVILLE, IN | |
2013-10-01 | Acquired United Commerce Bank (35306) in BLOOMINGTON, IN | |
2016-03-01 | Acquired River Valley Financial Bank (14714) in MADISON, IN | |
2018-04-01 | Changed name to German American Bank | |
2018-10-15 | Acquired First Security Bank (34524) in OWENSBORO, KY | |
2019-07-01 | Acquired Citizens First Bank, Inc. (35022) in BOWLING GREEN, KY |