GBC International Bank, History

The following are major historical events for GBC International Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1976-11-15Institution established: Original name:First Women's Bank of California
1984-08-30Changed name to Guaranty Bank of California
1994-10-17Acquired United American Bank (24499) in WESTMINSTER, CA
2005-05-13Acquired Sincere Federal Savings Bank (31992) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
2007-06-21Changed name to GBC International Bank
2010-10-01Acquired Shoreline Bank (35250) in SHORELINE, WA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2021-01-04Moved bank headquarters from 5670 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD, SUITE 1780, LOS ANGELES, CA to 333 S Grand Avenue, Suite 3500, Los Angeles, CA.