Home > Frost Bank > History

Frost Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Frost Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1899-02-20Institution established: Original name:The Frost National Bank of San Antonio
1988-02-19Acquired North Frost Bank, National Association (23688) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1988-03-04Acquired Colonial Frost Bank, National Association (21625) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1988-03-18Acquired Liberty Frost Bank, National Association (21540) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1988-03-18Acquired Citizens Frost Bank, National Association (18369) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1989-02-16Acquired Westpoint National Bank (25812) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1989-03-03Acquired Frost Bank North Austin, National Association (20834) in AUSTIN, TX
1989-05-19Acquired Parkdale Bank (17794) in CORPUS CHRISTI, TX
1989-08-03Acquired University National Bank (22457) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1989-08-24Acquired Summit Bank (21256) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1989-10-27Acquired First National Bank (22935) in BOERNE, TX
1989-10-27Acquired Fair Oaks National Bank (27204) in BEXAR COUNTY, TX
1991-06-07Acquired Portland State Bank (17896) in PORTLAND, TX
1993-02-13Acquired New First City, Texas - Austin, National Association (33714) in AUSTIN, TX
1993-02-13Acquired New First City, Texas - San Antonio, National Association (33729) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1993-10-01Changed name to The Frost National Bank
1993-11-05Acquired Cullen Center Bank & Trust (19988) in HOUSTON, TX
1994-04-14Acquired Texas Commerce Bank - Corpus Christi, National Association (18557) in CORPUS CHRISTI, TX
1995-05-19Acquired National Commerce Bank (26463) in HOUSTON, TX
1995-06-23Acquired The Valley National Bank (20513) in MCALLEN, TX
1996-03-22Acquired State Bank and Trust Company (8450) in SAN MARCOS, TX
1996-06-07Acquired Park National Bank of Houston (25757) in HOUSTON, TX
1997-03-07Acquired Citizens State Bank of Corpus Christi (16295) in CORPUS CHRISTI, TX
1998-01-02Acquired Harrisburg Bank, Houston, Texas (3261) in HOUSTON, TX
1998-05-29Acquired Overton Bank and Trust, National Association (22650) in FORT WORTH, TX
1999-01-14Acquired Keller State Bank (20469) in KELLER, TX
1999-05-20Acquired Bank of Commerce (15795) in FORT WORTH, TX
2000-05-26Acquired United States National Bank of Galveston (3212) in GALVESTON, TX
2005-10-07Acquired Horizon Capital Bank (18929) in HOUSTON, TX
2006-02-09Acquired Texas Community Bank and Trust, National Association (25296) in DALLAS, TX
2006-06-23Acquired Alamo Bank of Texas (10361) in ALAMO, TX
2006-12-08Acquired Summit Bank, National Association (21881) in FORT WORTH, TX
2012-06-22Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2012-06-22Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
2012-06-22Changed name to Frost Bank
2012-10-25Reorganized.
2014-06-21Acquired Western National Bank (22482) in ODESSA, TX