Home > Freehold Bank > History
Freehold Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Freehold Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1869-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Freehold Savings and Loan Association | |
2002-09-24 | Changed name to Freehold Savings and Loan Association | |
2009-01-01 | Changed name to Freehold Savings Bank | |
2009-01-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2018-09-28 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2018-09-28 | Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK | |
2018-09-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2019-10-29 | Changed name to Freehold Bank | |
2021-12-01 | Changed Chartering Agency to OCC. |