Frandsen Bank & Trust, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Frandsen Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.

1901-08-01Institution established: Original name:State Bank of New Ulm
1970-02-05Changed name to State Bank & Trust Company of New Ulm
2001-08-01Changed name to Valley Bank & Trust
2004-11-01Moved bank headquarters from NEW ULM, MN to LONSDALE, MN
2004-11-01Changed name to Frandsen Bank & Trust
2004-11-01Acquired Rural American Bank-Montgomery/Lonsdale (1921) in LONSDALE, MN
2005-04-01Acquired Valley Bank Dundas (1395) in DUNDAS, MN
2006-03-04Acquired Rural American Bank - Foley (10209) in FOLEY, MN
2008-08-18Acquired First National Bank of Montgomery (18705) in MONTGOMERY, MN
2009-10-19Acquired Northern National Bank (34592) in NISSWA, MN
2009-10-19Acquired Community Bank of the Red River Valley (19180) in EAST GRAND FORKS, MN
2010-05-17Acquired Valley Bank (18845) in WATERVILLE, MN
2011-03-21Acquired Rural American Bank - Braham (5099) in BRAHAM, MN
2011-03-21Acquired Rural American Bank - Luck (9525) in LUCK, WI
2011-08-22Acquired Queen City Federal Savings Bank (31204) in VIRGINIA, MN
2012-03-17Acquired State Bank of Bird Island (8184) in BIRD ISLAND, MN
2013-10-21Acquired Clinton State Bank (1099) in CLINTON, MN
2015-04-01Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2015-04-01Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
2016-10-22Acquired Provincial Bank (34443) in LAKEVILLE, MN
2020-10-17Acquired Peoples Bank Midwest (5347) in HAYWARD, WI