FNBT BANK, History
The following are major historical events for FNBT BANK, including mergers and acquisitions.
1956-04-09 | Institution established: Original name:Southern National Bank of Fort Walton Beach | |
1965-02-15 | Changed name to First National Bank of Fort Walton Beach | |
1977-06-07 | Changed name to First National Bank of Okaloosa County | |
1985-02-01 | Reorganized. | |
1985-08-30 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1985-12-02 | Changed name to First National Bank and Trust | |
2009-06-22 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2009-06-22 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2009-06-22 | Changed name to FNBT.COM BANK | |
2015-08-17 | Changed name to FNBT BANK |