Home > Flat Branch Bank > History
Flat Branch Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Flat Branch Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1940-07-01 | Institution established: Original name:Hardin State Bank | |
1982-01-22 | Changed name to Ray County Bank | |
1982-10-01 | Moved bank headquarters from HARDIN, MO to RICHMOND, MO | |
1996-04-29 | Changed name to The State Bank | |
2024-03-15 | Changed name to Flat Branch Bank. |