Home > FirstBank Southwest > History
FirstBank Southwest, History
The following are major historical events for FirstBank Southwest, including mergers and acquisitions.
1907-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Perryton | |
1986-12-18 | Acquired First Bank & Trust Co. (12294) in BOOKER, TX | |
1995-08-25 | Changed name to FirstBank Southwest, National Association | |
1995-08-25 | Moved bank headquarters from PERRYTON, TX to AMARILLO, TX | |
1995-08-25 | Acquired The First National Bank of Hereford (3252) in HEREFORD, TX | |
1995-08-25 | Acquired FirstBank Southwest (17473) in AMARILLO, TX | |
1995-08-25 | Acquired Citizens Bank and Trust Company (15743) in PAMPA, TX | |
2005-10-12 | Changed name to FirstBank Southwest | |
2005-10-12 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2005-10-12 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2005-10-25 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2005-10-25 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2006-01-06 | Acquired Western National Bank (19203) in AMARILLO, TX |