First United Bank & Trust, History

The following are major historical events for First United Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.

1900-01-01Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Oakland
1970-01-02Acquired The First National Bank of Barton (4827) in BARTON, MD
1970-01-02Acquired The Citizens National Bank of Westernport (4872) in WESTERNPORT, MD
1983-11-21Changed name to First United National Bank & Trust
1983-11-21Acquired Cumberland Savings Bank (9698) in CUMBERLAND, MD
1985-07-01Reorganized.
1995-08-28Acquired First United Bank of West Virginia, National Association (6788) in OAKLAND, MD
1995-11-20Acquired Myersville Bank (13771) in MYERSVILLE, MD
1998-07-15Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
1998-07-15Changed name to First United Bank & Trust