Home > First Texas Bank > History
First Texas Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Texas Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1962-01-05 | Changed name to Citizens State Bank | |
1992-12-31 | Changed name to First Texas Bank | |
2004-03-02 | Changed name to First Texas Bank Georgetown | |
2004-03-03 | Changed name to First Texas Bank | |
2012-06-11 | Acquired First Texas Bank (20825) in ROUND ROCK, TX |