Home > First State Community Bank > History
First State Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First State Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1954-05-11 | Institution established: Original name:First State Bank of Farmington | |
1996-09-25 | Changed name to First State Community Bank | |
1998-06-12 | Acquired Joachim Federal Savings and Loan Association (31332) in DESOTO, MO | |
1999-01-08 | Acquired Iron County Security Bank (14386) in IRONTON, MO | |
2013-01-12 | Acquired Bank Star of the LeadBelt (16107) in PARK HILLS, MO | |
2016-05-21 | Acquired Central Bank (1057) in LEBANON, MO |