Home > First State Bank Nebraska > History
First State Bank Nebraska, History
The following are major historical events for First State Bank Nebraska, including mergers and acquisitions.
1912-12-12 | Institution established: Original name:First State Bank | |
2001-04-10 | Moved bank headquarters from HICKMAN, NE to LINCOLN, NE | |
2004-12-03 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2004-12-03 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2006-05-13 | Acquired Bank of Yutan (18795) in YUTAN, NE | |
2007-09-15 | Acquired Saline State Bank (14516) in WILBER, NE | |
2009-09-18 | Acquired Filley Bank (16963) in FILLEY, NE | |
2010-05-01 | Acquired The Farmers Bank (18794) in LINCOLN, NE | |
2010-05-01 | Acquired De Witt State Bank (8339) in DE WITT, NE | |
2012-03-02 | Changed name to First State Bank Nebraska | |
2018-12-04 | Acquired The Nehawka Bank (11483) in NEHAWKA, NE | |
2020-11-16 | Acquired Plattsmouth State Bank (8350) in PLATTSMOUTH, NE |