Home > First State Bank and Trust > History
First State Bank and Trust, History
The following are major historical events for First State Bank and Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-12-22 | Institution established: Original name:The First State Bank of Tonganoxie | |
1935-04-05 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1935-04-05 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1963-02-18 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1963-02-18 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1982-06-09 | Changed name to First State Bank and Trust | |
1985-08-21 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1995-07-06 | Acquired Home State Bank of Clearwater (17649) in CLEARWATER, KS | |
2002-07-10 | Acquired The Bank of Perry (13689) in PERRY, KS |