Home > First Southern Bank > History
First Southern Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Southern Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1937-12-15 | Institution established: Original name:The Bank of Marion | |
2005-06-25 | Acquired The Egyptian State Bank (17060) in CARRIER MILLS, IL | |
2006-10-01 | Acquired C. P. Burnett & Sons, Bankers (1041) in ELDORADO, IL | |
2014-08-18 | Changed name to First Southern Bank | |
2014-08-18 | Acquired First Southern Bank (3796) in CARBONDALE, IL | |
2014-12-06 | Acquired Herrin Security Bank (17793) in HERRIN, IL | |
2022-07-01 | Acquired The Bank of CarbondaleFirst Southern Bank (10828) in CARBONDALE, IL. |