First Security Bank - Sleepy Eye, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First Security Bank - Sleepy Eye, including mergers and acquisitions.

1882-01-01Institution established: Original name:First Security State Bank of Sleepy Eye
1985-06-14Acquired Swift County Bank (1602) in BENSON, MN
1986-07-01Changed name to First Security State Bank
1990-08-24Acquired Lakeland Savings Bank, F.S.B. (32947) in DETROIT LAKES, MN
1997-10-01Changed name to First Security Bank - Sleepy Eye
2008-07-14Acquired First Security Bank - Renville (10961) in RENVILLE, MN
2011-02-14Acquired First Security Bank - Evansville (8186) in EVANSVILLE, MN