Home > First Secure State Bank > History
First Secure State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Secure State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1979-10-22 | Institution established: Original name:Wonder Lake State Bank | |
1987-09-11 | Reorganized. | |
1990-08-09 | Changed name to State Bank | |
2016-08-01 | Acquired Harvard Savings Bank (28938) in HARVARD, IL | |
2024-04-01 | Changed name to First Secure State Bank. |