First Savings Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1989-01-01Institution established: Original name:First Savings Bank, FSB
1995-03-03Acquired Home Federal Savings Bank of New Mexico (29107) in DEMING, NM
1995-12-31Acquired Sun World Federal Savings Bank (31757) in ALAMOGORDO, NM
1996-01-23Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
1996-01-23Changed name to First Savings Bank
2011-07-21Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
2018-12-14Acquired The Roberts County National Bank of Sisseton (4019) in SISSETON, SD
2019-04-01Acquired Western Bank (22525) in ALAMOGORDO, NM