Home > First Neighbor Bank > History
First Neighbor Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Neighbor Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1933-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank in Toledo | |
1991-04-01 | Reorganized. | |
2001-06-23 | Acquired The Greenup National Bank (3676) in GREENUP, IL | |
2002-07-15 | Acquired First State Bank of Newman (11675) in NEWMAN, IL | |
2004-05-01 | Changed name to First Neighbor Bank, National Association |