Home > First Nebraska Bank > History
First Nebraska Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Nebraska Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Valley | |
1986-09-01 | Changed name to First Nebraska Bank | |
1988-02-01 | Acquired First Nebraska Bank (11472) in BRAINARD, NE | |
1988-02-01 | Acquired First Nebraska Bank, National Association (23877) in COLUMBUS, NE | |
1988-02-01 | Acquired First Nebraska Bank (14591) in DECATUR, NE | |
1988-02-01 | Acquired First Nebraska Bank, National Association (5477) in STANTON, NE | |
1988-02-01 | Acquired First Nebraska Bank, National Association (5399) in EMERSON, NE | |
1989-08-01 | Acquired First Nebraska Bank (14337) in ARCADIA, NE | |
2012-08-01 | Acquired Heartland Community Bank (34053) in BENNET, NE |