Home > First National Bank and Trust Company of Ardmore > History
First National Bank and Trust Company of Ardmore, History
The following are major historical events for First National Bank and Trust Company of Ardmore, including mergers and acquisitions.
1889-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank at Ardmore | |
1964-03-02 | Changed name to First National Bank and Trust Company of Ardmore | |
1996-06-10 | Acquired Bank of Love County (24750) in MARIETTA, OK | |
1996-09-27 | Acquired First Community Bank and Trust Company of Lone Grove (22716) in LONE GROVE, OK | |
1997-10-01 | Acquired Ringling State Bank (4188) in RINGLING, OK | |
2008-06-30 | Acquired Citizens Bank (20125) in VELMA, OK |