Home > First National Bank > History
First National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1864-04-19 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Damariscotta | |
1985-06-06 | Reorganized. | |
2005-01-14 | Acquired The First National Bank of Bar Harbor (4247) in BAR HARBOR, ME | |
2005-01-31 | Changed name to The First, N.A. | |
2016-01-28 | Changed name to First National Bank |