Home > First National Bank > History
First National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1889-03-22 | Institution established: Original name:National Bank of Commerce of Paragould | |
1967-06-30 | Changed name to First National Bank of Commerce | |
1973-02-15 | Changed name to First National Bank | |
2002-11-16 | Acquired The Corning Bank (25234) in CORNING, AR | |
2018-08-01 | Acquired One Bank & Trust, National Association (17800) in LITTLE ROCK, AR | |
2021-09-01 | Acquired Citizens BankFirst National Bank (6103) in HARTSVILLE, TN. |