Home > First National Bank > History
First National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1976-05-06 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank of Hamilton | |
1986-01-31 | Reorganized. | |
1991-12-19 | Changed name to First National Bank | |
2002-04-01 | Acquired The Bank of Berry (43) in BERRY, AL | |
2002-04-03 | Acquired Bank of Carbon Hill (15554) in CARBON HILL, AL | |
2002-05-09 | Acquired The Bank of Parrish (63) in PARRISH, AL |