Home > First Merchants Bank > History
First Merchants Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Merchants Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1893-03-13 | Institution established: Original name:The Merchants National Bank of Muncie | |
1991-12-16 | Changed name to First Merchants Bank National Association | |
2006-01-01 | Acquired First United Bank, National Association (202) in MIDDLETOWN, IN | |
2007-04-01 | Acquired United Communities National Bank (15620) in WINCHESTER, IN | |
2007-04-01 | Acquired The First National Bank of Portland (4371) in PORTLAND, IN | |
2007-04-01 | Acquired Frances Slocum Bank and Trust Company, National Association (18927) in WABASH, IN | |
2007-04-01 | Acquired Decatur Bank and Trust Company, National Association (19668) in DECATUR, IN | |
2009-09-25 | Acquired First Merchants Bank of Central Indiana, National Association (8047) in ANDERSON, IN | |
2009-09-25 | Acquired Lafayette Bank and Trust Company, National Association (16512) in LAFAYETTE, IN | |
2009-09-25 | Acquired Commerce National Bank (33433) in COLUMBUS, OH | |
2010-09-17 | Acquired First Merchants Trust Company, National Association (57573) in MUNCIE, IN | |
2012-02-10 | Acquired SCB Bank (29761) in SHELBYVILLE, IN as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2013-11-13 | Acquired Citizens Financial Bank (29367) in MUNSTER, IN | |
2014-11-08 | Acquired Community Bank (13147) in NOBLESVILLE, IN | |
2015-04-17 | Acquired Cooper State Bank (58041) in DUBLIN, OH | |
2015-12-31 | Acquired Ameriana Bank (29031) in NEW CASTLE, IN | |
2016-04-15 | Changed name to First Merchants Bank | |
2016-04-15 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2016-04-15 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2017-05-19 | Acquired The Arlington Bank (34977) in UPPER ARLINGTON, OH | |
2017-07-14 | Acquired IAB Financial Bank (16400) in FORT WAYNE, IN | |
2019-09-01 | Acquired Monroe Bank & Trust (12181) in MONROE, MI |