First Interstate Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First Interstate Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1916-10-09Institution established: Original name:Security Trust and Savings Bank
1974-08-01Changed name to Security Bank, N. A.
1984-07-01Changed name to First Interstate Bank of Billings, National Association
1992-12-01Changed name to The First Interstate Bank of Commerce
1992-12-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of South Missoula, National Association (33742) in MISSOULA, MT
1992-12-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of Missoula, National Association (2195) in MISSOULA, MT
1992-12-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of Hardin (16227) in HARDIN, MT
1992-12-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of Miles City (21695) in MILES CITY, MT
1992-12-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of Colstrip (22019) in COLSTRIP, MT
1992-12-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of Billings Heights (23023) in BILLINGS, MT
1992-12-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of West Billings (22415) in BILLINGS, MT
1995-05-05Acquired First Citizens Bank of Bozeman (23372) in BOZEMAN, MT
1995-09-23Acquired The First National Park Bank in Livingston (2193) in LIVINGSTON, MT
1997-06-21Acquired Mountain Bank (19279) in WHITEFISH, MT
1997-06-21Changed name to First Interstate Bank
1997-06-21Acquired First Interstate Bank of Montana, National Association (2189) in KALISPELL, MT
1997-12-23Acquired First Interstate Bank, FSB (34260) in HAMILTON, MT
1999-09-01Acquired Security State Bank and Trust Company (362) in POLSON, MT
2001-11-10Acquired First Interstate Bank (524) in SHERIDAN, WY
2003-01-27Acquired The United States National Bank of Red Lodge (2200) in RED LODGE, MT
2009-09-26Acquired First Western Bank (488) in WALL, SD
2009-09-26Acquired The First Western Bank Sturgis (26773) in STURGIS, SD
2014-10-18Acquired Mountain West Bank, National Association (33314) in HELENA, MT
2015-07-25Acquired United Bank (18772) in ABSAROKEE, MT
2016-08-13Acquired Flathead Bank of Bigfork, Montana (20382) in BIGFORK, MT
2017-08-12Acquired Bank of the Cascades (22407) in BEND, OR
2018-11-10Acquired Inland Northwest Bank (27601) in SPOKANE, WA
2019-04-08Acquired Idaho Independent Bank (33845) in COEUR D ALENE, ID
2019-04-08Acquired Community 1st Bank (58576) in POST FALLS, ID