Home > First Foundation Bank > History
First Foundation Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Foundation Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
2007-10-01 | Institution established: Original name:First Foundation Bank | |
2010-12-31 | Changed institution class to OCC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANKS | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2012-06-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2012-06-28 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2012-06-28 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2012-08-15 | Acquired Desert Commercial Bank (57976) in PALM DESERT, CA | |
2015-06-16 | Acquired Pacific Rim Bank (58137) in HONOLULU, HI | |
2017-11-10 | Acquired Community 1st Bank (58191) in AUBURN, CA | |
2018-06-01 | Acquired Premier Business Bank (58261) in LOS ANGELES, CA |