Home > First Financial Bank > History
First Financial Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Financial Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1863-08-03 | Institution established: Original name:Terre Haute First National Bank | |
2003-10-01 | Changed name to First Financial Bank, National Association | |
2003-10-18 | Acquired First Ridge Farm State Bank (16315) in RIDGE FARM, IL | |
2003-11-28 | Acquired First National Bank (1799) in MARSHALL, IL | |
2004-02-20 | Acquired First Citizens State Bank (9283) in NEWPORT, IN | |
2004-05-16 | Acquired First Parke State Bank (9654) in ROCKVILLE, IN | |
2004-07-25 | Acquired First State Bank (25325) in BRAZIL, IN | |
2004-09-19 | Acquired First Farmers State Bank (17456) in SULLIVAN, IN | |
2005-02-13 | Acquired First Crawford State Bank (12399) in ROBINSON, IL | |
2005-09-10 | Acquired First Community Bank, National Association (30319) in OLNEY, IL | |
2009-07-02 | Acquired The First National Bank of Danville (3644) in DANVILLE, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-12-31 | Acquired Freestar Bank, National Association (14736) in PONTIAC, IL | |
2019-07-27 | Acquired Heritage Bank USA, Inc. (30090) in HOPKINSVILLE, KY |