Home > First Fidelity Bank > History
First Fidelity Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Fidelity Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1965-05-03 | Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Dekalb County | |
1986-04-30 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
1996-07-01 | Changed name to First Federal Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2014-07-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2014-07-01 | Changed name to First Fidelity Bank | |
2014-07-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2014-07-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK |