Home > First Fidelity Bank > History
First Fidelity Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Fidelity Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1981-07-01 | Institution established: Original name:Commercial Bank, National Association | |
1987-10-16 | Maintained operations with government open bank assistance. | |
1989-09-08 | Acquired Mercantile Bank, N.A. (22936) in MOORE, OK | |
1990-08-16 | Acquired Capitol Bank & Trust (18290) in OKLAHOMA CITY, OK | |
1992-09-08 | Acquired City National Bank & Trust Company (4158) in NORMAN, OK | |
1996-09-20 | Acquired Community Bank & Trust Co. (18472) in WARR ACRES, OK | |
1998-12-11 | Reorganized. | |
2006-11-17 | Acquired Edmond Bank and Trust (34996) in EDMOND, OK | |
2007-06-23 | Acquired First Fidelity Bank, National Association (58288) in PHOENIX, AZ | |
2007-06-23 | Acquired Western Security Bank (24445) in SCOTTSDALE, AZ | |
2013-08-23 | Acquired SUNRISE BANK OF ARIZONA (34707) in PHOENIX, AZ as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2016-12-15 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2016-12-15 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2016-12-15 | Changed name to First Fidelity Bank |