First Fidelity Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First Fidelity Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1905-01-01Institution established: Original name:Burke State Bank
1940-05-14Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS
1940-05-14Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
1974-01-01Changed name to First Fidelity Bank
1986-06-02Acquired First Fidelity Bank (16121) in COLOME, SD
1986-06-02Acquired First Fidelity Bank (1683) in MURDO, SD
1990-06-11Acquired Ranchers National Bank of Winner (18669) in WINNER, SD