Home > First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign Urbana > History
First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign Urbana, History
The following are major historical events for First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign Urbana, including mergers and acquisitions.
1908-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Champaign | |
1991-01-25 | Changed name to First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Champaign-Urbana | |
1995-01-09 | Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign Urbana | |
1995-01-25 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1995-06-30 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |