First Federal Bank & Trust, History

The following are major historical events for First Federal Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.

1935-10-16Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings and Loan Association
1991-03-01Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank
1991-03-01Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK
2009-01-06Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
2011-07-21Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
2016-01-27Changed name to First Federal Bank & Trust