Home > First Federal Bank > History
First Federal Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Federal Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1961-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1987-03-31 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1987-03-31 | Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank of Florida | |
2005-09-14 | Moved bank headquarters from LIVE OAK, FL to LAKE CITY, FL | |
2007-12-10 | Changed name to First Federal Bank of Florida | |
2009-10-23 | Acquired Flagship National Bank (35044) in BRADENTON, FL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-05-07 | Acquired The Bank of Bonifay (14246) in BONIFAY, FL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2013-04-19 | Acquired Chipola Community Bank (58034) in MARIANNA, FL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2013-10-30 | Acquired Bank of Jackson County (14794) in GRACEVILLE, FL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2018-04-02 | Acquired CBC NATIONAL BANK (35309) in FERNANDINA BEACH, FL | |
2018-06-01 | Changed name to First Federal Bank |