Home > First Eagle Bank > History
First Eagle Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Eagle Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1985-02-14 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank of Roselle | |
1991-02-15 | Changed name to First Eagle National Bank | |
1994-02-22 | Moved bank headquarters from ROSELLE, IL to HANOVER PARK, IL | |
2007-06-28 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2007-06-28 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2007-06-28 | Changed name to First Eagle Bank | |
2007-06-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2013-09-13 | Moved bank headquarters from HANOVER PARK, IL to CHICAGO, IL |