First Dakota National Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First Dakota National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1872-12-07Institution established: Original name:The First Dakota National Bank and Trust Company of Yankton
1940-03-08Changed name to First Dakota National Bank
1988-05-18Acquired The American State Bank (6086) in YANKTON, SD
1993-04-01Acquired The McCook County National Bank of Salem (4013) in SALEM, SD
2013-01-19Acquired BANK 360 (30789) in BERESFORD, SD
2016-01-01Acquired Dakota State Bank (1682) in BLUNT, SD