First Commonwealth Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First Commonwealth Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1880-09-21Institution established: Original name:The Deposit National Bank of Du Bois
1950-11-10Changed name to Du Bois Deposit National Bank
1973-01-01Changed name to Deposit National Bank
1977-03-01Acquired Farmers and Merchants Bank (18040) in ST. MARYS, PA
1980-01-02Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
1980-01-02Changed name to Deposit Bank
1995-11-13Changed name to First Commonwealth Bank
1995-11-13Moved bank headquarters from DU BOIS, PA to INDIANA, PA
1995-11-13Acquired Central Bank (7439) in HOLLIDAYSBURG, PA
1995-11-13Acquired Peoples Bank of Western Pennsylvania (13994) in NEW CASTLE, PA
1995-11-13Acquired Cenwest National Bank (7455) in JOHNSTOWN, PA
1995-11-13Acquired Peoples Bank and Trust Company (8412) in JENNERSTOWN, PA
1995-11-13Acquired Unitas National Bank (7534) in CHAMBERSBURG, PA
1995-11-13Acquired First National Bank of Leechburg (7904) in LEECHBURG, PA
1995-11-13Acquired National Bank of the Commonwealth (14221) in INDIANA, PA
1997-09-27Acquired Reliable Savings Bank (27940) in BRIDGEVILLE, PA
2002-10-15Acquired Southwest Bank (7979) in GREENSBURG, PA
2003-12-05Acquired Pittsburgh Savings Bank (30197) in PITTSBURGH, PA
2004-05-24Acquired Great American Federal (27670) in PITTSBURGH, PA
2006-01-01Acquired First Commonwealth Trust Company (33574) in INDIANA, PA
2006-08-28Acquired Laurel Savings Bank (27956) in ALLISON PARK, PA
2015-10-01Acquired First Community Bank (17520) in WHITEHALL, OH
2017-04-03Acquired The Delaware County Bank and Trust Company (16940) in LEWIS CENTER, OH
2018-05-01Acquired Foundation Bank (28724) in CINCINNATI, OH