First Citizens National Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First Citizens National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1889-01-01Institution established: Original name:First-Citizens National Bank of Dyersburg
1982-02-20Acquired Bank of Yorkville (2376) in YORKVILLE, TN
1994-09-21Changed name to First Citizens National Bank
1999-02-15Acquired The Bank of Troy (2405) in TROY, TN
1999-06-14Acquired First Volunteer Bank (9193) in UNION CITY, TN
2016-09-30Acquired Southern Heritage Bank (35093) in CLEVELAND, TN