First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.

1898-01-01Institution established: Original name:First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
1971-01-29Acquired The Haynes Bank (5945) in CLIFFSIDE, NC
1974-05-01Moved bank headquarters from SMITHFIELD, NC to RALEIGH, NC
1974-09-30Acquired The Bank of Coleridge (372) in RAMSEUR, NC
1974-09-30Acquired The Bank of Commerce (16178) in CHARLOTTE, NC
1979-11-01Acquired Bank of Conway (12264) in CONWAY, NC
1981-12-15Acquired Commercial & Farmers Bank (2020) in RURAL HALL, NC
1981-12-15Acquired Commercial & Savings Bank (14362) in BOONVILLE, NC
1983-06-29Acquired Peoples Bank of North Carolina (19773) in MADISON, NC
1985-03-28Acquired First State Bank (376) in WINTERVILLE, NC
1985-03-28Acquired Farmers Bank (8630) in PILOT MOUNTAIN, NC
1985-07-11Acquired Farmers Bank of Sunbury (373) in SUNBURY, NC
1990-09-21Acquired Heritage Federal Savings and Loan Association (30613) in MONROE, NC
1990-09-21Acquired North Carolina Savings and Loan Association, F.A. (32936) in CHARLOTTE, NC
1991-01-01Acquired Mutual Savings and Loan Association, Inc. (30078) in CHARLOTTE, NC
1991-07-01Acquired First Federal Savings Bank (29165) in HENDERSONVILLE, NC
1993-06-19Acquired Caldwell Savings Bank, Inc., S.S.B. (32350) in LENOIR, NC
1993-08-27Acquired Surety Federal Savings and Loan Association, F.A. (33459) in MORGANTON, NC as part of a government assisted transaction.
1993-09-24Acquired Pioneer Savings Bank, Inc. (27835) in ROCKY MOUNT, NC
1994-03-25Acquired The Bank of Bladenboro (12962) in BLADENBORO, NC
1994-08-05Acquired Edgecomb Homestead Savings Bank, Inc., SSB (28499) in TARBORO, NC
1994-12-09Acquired First Republic Savings Bank FSB (30498) in ROANOKE RAPIDS, NC
1995-02-24Acquired First Investors Savings Bank, Inc., SSB (32359) in WHITEVILLE, NC
1995-03-03Acquired State Bank (26913) in FAYETTEVILLE, NC
1996-01-01Acquired First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (20019) in LAWRENCEVILLE, VA
1996-02-14Acquired Summit Savings Bank, Inc., SSB (32358) in SANFORD, NC
1996-02-14Acquired Peoples Savings Bank, Inc., SSB (28817) in WILMINGTON, NC
1996-10-01Reorganized.
1997-09-27Acquired First Savings Bank of Rockingham County, SSB (28030) in REIDSVILLE, NC
1998-10-16Acquired First Citizens Bank & Trust Company (10003) in WHITE SULPHUR SPRINGS, WV
1999-01-31Reorganized.
2003-10-20Acquired Avery County Bank (13191) in NEWLAND, NC
2006-06-15Acquired First-Citizens Bank, National Association (34453) in ROANOKE, VA
2009-07-17Acquired Temecula Valley Bank (34341) in TEMECULA, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-11Acquired Venture Bank (22868) in LACEY, WA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-29Acquired First Regional Bank (23011) in LOS ANGELES, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-03-05Acquired Sun American Bank (27126) in BOCA RATON, FL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-01-07Acquired IronStone Bank (34340) in FORT MYERS, FL
2011-01-21Acquired United Western Bank (31293) in DENVER, CO as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-08Acquired Colorado Capital Bank (34522) in CASTLE ROCK, CO as part of a government assisted transaction.
2014-01-01Acquired Mountain 1st Bank & Trust Company (57763) in HENDERSONVILLE, NC
2015-01-01Acquired First Citizens Bank and Trust Company, Inc. (15504) in COLUMBIA, SC
2015-02-13Acquired Capitol City Bank & Trust Company (33938) in ATLANTA, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2016-03-11Acquired North Milwaukee State Bank (20364) in MILWAUKEE, WI as part of a government assisted transaction.
2016-05-06Acquired First CornerStone Bank (35312) in KING OF PRUSSIA, PA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2016-09-01Acquired Bank of Virginia (57627) in MIDLOTHIAN, VA
2017-01-13Acquired Harvest Community Bank (34951) in PENNSVILLE, NJ as part of a government assisted transaction.
2017-05-05Acquired Guaranty Bank (30003) in MILWAUKEE, WI as part of a government assisted transaction.
2018-04-30Acquired HomeBanc (58194) in TAMPA, FL
2018-10-02Acquired Securant Bank & Trust (12515) in MENOMONEE FALLS, WI
2018-11-01Acquired Palmetto Heritage Bank & Trust (57880) in PAWLEYS ISLAND, SC
2019-04-01Acquired Biscayne Bank (57973) in COCONUT GROVE, FL
2019-05-01Acquired First South Bank (34222) in SPARTANBURG, SC
2019-12-31Acquired Entegra Bank (31445) in Franklin, NC
2020-02-01Acquired Gwinnett Community Bank (35249) in DULUTH, GA