Home > First Bankers Trust Company > History
First Bankers Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for First Bankers Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1946-10-23 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank & Trust Company of Quincy | |
1983-11-07 | Acquired Community National Bank of Quincy (20555) in QUINCY, IL | |
1986-06-26 | Changed name to First Midwest Bank/Quincy, National Association | |
1986-08-20 | Acquired Mendon State Bank (13714) in MENDON, IL | |
1988-01-01 | Acquired First Midwest Bank/Hancock County, National Association (14338) in CARTHAGE, IL | |
1988-01-01 | Changed name to First Midwest Bank/M.C., National Association | |
1989-06-30 | Changed name to First Bankers Trust Company, National Association | |
1999-08-20 | Changed name to Bankers Trust Company, National Association | |
1999-12-17 | Changed name to First Bankers Trust Company, National Association |