Home > First Bank > History
First Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1907-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Farmers State Bank in Sterling | |
1994-11-09 | Acquired The First National Bank of Sterling (4776) in STERLING, KS | |
1996-05-01 | Acquired The Coronado Bank of Lyons (14041) in LYONS, KS | |
1996-09-12 | Acquired Bank Chase (16697) in CHASE, KS | |
1998-09-01 | Changed name to First Bank | |
2000-09-06 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED |