Home > First Bank > History

First Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1934-01-01Institution established: Original name:Bank of Montgomery
1985-02-20Changed name to First Bank
1987-07-10Acquired The Bank of Candor (8926) in CANDOR, NC
1994-08-26Acquired Central State Bank (9856) in HIGH POINT, NC
1995-12-15Acquired First Scotland Bank (25839) in LAURINBURG, NC
2000-11-17Acquired First Savings Bank of Moore County, Inc., SSB (28074) in SOUTHERN PINES, NC
2001-09-18Acquired Home Savings, SSB (31012) in THOMASVILLE, NC
2003-05-16Acquired Carolina Community Bank, National Association (11537) in LATTA, SC
2008-05-16Acquired Sentry Bank & Trust (28032) in CHERAW, SC
2009-06-20Acquired Cooperative Bank (27837) in WILMINGTON, NC as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-01-21Acquired The Bank of Asheville (34516) in ASHEVILLE, NC as part of a government assisted transaction.
2013-09-04Moved bank headquarters from TROY, NC to SOUTHERN PINES, NC
2015-04-22Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
2015-04-22Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2017-03-04Acquired Carolina Bank (34348) in GREENSBORO, NC
2017-10-01Acquired Asheville Savings Bank, S.S.B. (29663) in ASHEVILLE, NC