Home > First American Bank and Trust > History
First American Bank and Trust, History
The following are major historical events for First American Bank and Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1910-12-03 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Vacherie | |
1978-01-17 | Changed name to First American Bank and Trust | |
1989-11-02 | Acquired Bank of St. Charles (11786) in ST. ROSE, LA | |
1991-02-14 | Acquired Merchants Trust & Savings Bank (16965) in KENNER, LA | |
1996-09-24 | Acquired First American Bank of Tangipahoa (25805) in HAMMOND, LA | |
2001-07-31 | Acquired Schwegmann Bank and Trust Company (25139) in HARVEY, LA |