Home > First American Bank and Trust Company > History
First American Bank and Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for First American Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Hubert State Bank | |
1964-01-14 | Changed name to First American Bank and Trust Company | |
1997-05-09 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2009-07-17 | Acquired First Piedmont Bank (34594) in WINDER, GA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-06-24 | Acquired Mountain Heritage Bank (57593) in CLAYTON, GA as part of a government assisted transaction. |