Home > First American Bank > History
First American Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First American Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1903-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Artesia | |
1995-10-18 | Changed name to The First National Bank | |
2009-01-30 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2009-01-30 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2009-01-30 | Changed name to First American Bank | |
2010-06-25 | Acquired High Desert State Bank (35279) in ALBUQUERQUE, NM as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2014-11-08 | Acquired AmBank (34302) in SILVER CITY, NM | |
2022-06-17 | Acquired United Bank of El Paso del NorteFirst American Bank (57119) in EL PASO, TX. |