Fifth Third Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Fifth Third Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1865-01-01Institution established: Original name:The Citizens National Bank & Trust Company of Piqua
1963-12-31Changed name to The Miami Citizens National Bank & Trust Company
1987-01-01Acquired Heritage National Bank and Trust Company (6673) in PIQUA, OH
1987-01-01Changed name to Citizens Heritage Bank, National Association
1989-01-01Changed name to The Fifth Third Bank of Miami Valley, National Association
1989-11-30Acquired The Citizens State Bank of Greenville, Ohio (8650) in GREENVILLE, OH
1991-11-25Changed name to The Fifth Third Bank of Western Ohio, National Association
1991-11-25Acquired The Fifth Third Bank of Western Ohio, National Association (24673) in WAPAKONETA, OH
1992-09-05Acquired First Lima National Bank of Lima, Ohio (28452) in LIMA, OH
1994-08-01Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
1994-08-01Changed name to Fifth Third Bank of Western Ohio
1997-06-21Moved bank headquarters from PIQUA, OH to DAYTON, OH
1998-08-15Acquired Citizens Federal Bank, F.S.B., a Federal Savings Bank (29119) in DAYTON, OH
2000-12-29Acquired The Fifth Third Bank of Columbus (26321) in COLUMBUS, OH
2000-12-29Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Ohio Valley (13226) in HILLSBORO, OH
2000-12-29Moved bank headquarters from DAYTON, OH to CINCINNATI, OH
2000-12-29Changed name to Fifth Third Bank
2000-12-29Acquired The Fifth Third Bank (743) in CINCINNATI, OH
2000-12-29Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Northwestern Ohio, National Association (776) in TOLEDO, OH
2001-03-10Acquired Capital Bank National Association (27576) in SYLVANIA, OH
2009-09-30Acquired Fifth Third Bank (993) in GRAND RAPIDS, MI
2009-09-30Acquired Fifth Third Bank, National Association (32712) in NASHVILLE, TN
2019-05-04Acquired MB Financial Bank, National Association (3628) in CHICAGO, IL
2019-11-14Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
2019-11-14Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS
2019-11-14Changed name to Fifth Third Bank, National Association