Home > Field & Main Bank > History
Field & Main Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Field & Main Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-02-02 | Institution established: Original name:Ohio Valley National Bank of Henderson | |
1992-11-20 | Reorganized. | |
2006-12-27 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2006-12-27 | Changed name to Ohio Valley Bank | |
2006-12-27 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2008-01-01 | Changed name to Ohio Valley Financial Group | |
2015-01-24 | Acquired BankTrust Financial (35380) in HENDERSON, KY | |
2015-08-26 | Changed name to Field & Main Bank |