Fidelity Co-operative Bank, History

The following are major historical events for Fidelity Co-operative Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1888-01-01Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Fidelity Co-operative Bank
1984-04-01Acquired Gardner Co-operative Bank (31076) in GARDNER, MA
1985-12-06Became FDIC insured.
1998-03-15Acquired Shirley Co-operative Bank (26445) in SHIRLEY, MA
2006-10-03Changed organization type to COOPERATIVE BANK STOCK
2016-04-01Acquired Barre Savings Bank (90148) in BARRE, MA
2018-04-01Acquired Colonial Co-operative Bank (26556) in GARDNER, MA
2020-01-01Acquired Family Federal Savings, F.A. (29962) in FITCHBURG, MA
2020-02-24Moved bank headquarters from FITCHBURG, MA to Leominster, MA