Home > Fidelity Bank > History
Fidelity Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Fidelity Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1956-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Fidelity Savings Association of Kansas | |
1996-01-31 | Changed name to Fidelity Savings Bank | |
1997-01-01 | Changed name to Fidelity Bank | |
2004-01-12 | Acquired Bridgeview Bank, National Association (23530) in OKLAHOMA CITY, OK | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2019-09-16 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2019-09-16 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2019-09-16 | Changed name to Fidelity Bank, National Association | |
2021-10-22 | Acquired Yorktown BankFidelity Bank, National Association (24342) in PRYOR, OK. |