Home > Farmers State Bank > History
Farmers State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Farmers State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Farmers State Bank of Cameron | |
1951-06-13 | Changed name to Farmers State Bank | |
1999-05-21 | Acquired The Farmers and Valley Bank, Tarkio, Missouri (8901) in TARKIO, MO | |
2010-12-03 | Acquired Exchange Bank of Fairfax (8563) in FAIRFAX, MO | |
2014-01-17 | Acquired Midwest Federal Savings and Loan Association of St Joseph (28731) in SAINT JOSEPH, MO |